Financial history MINISTERIO NOVA VIDA

Charity number: 1125377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £12.91k £14.63k £11.28k £12.65k £13.97k
Total expenditure £8.96k £11.52k £11.15k £8.54k £12.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A