Trustees UCU PARTNERS UK
Charity number: 1124991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS DOBSON | Chair | 05 February 2009 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Gibson | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Watts | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE MACHELL | Trustee | 28 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BUTTON | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSIE BUTTON | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.