Financial history THE BUTTERFIELD CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1125156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £150.29k £133.91k £134.43k £135.63k £190.43k
Total expenditure £164.56k £152.51k £154.08k £145.41k £101.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £52.29k