Financial history WOMEN4RESOURCES

Charity number: 1126029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.38k £17.40k £15.23k £16.42k £1.61k
Total expenditure £10.98k £13.01k £11.84k £13.82k £17.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A