Governance THE FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION NATIONAL CLINICAL GROUP
Charity number: 1125319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 01 August 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 November 2010: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 March 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.