CHRISTIAN LIAISON FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 1127911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £17.67k £7.72k £6.66k £5.35k £4.46k
Total expenditure £13.37k £4.57k £6.50k £6.45k £4.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A