THE THORESBY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1126086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR JOHN ANTHONY CHARTRES Chair 07 May 2011 None on record
GRETA MEREDITH Trustee None on record
DIANE TAYLOR Trustee None on record
Dr Peter Ian Maw Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Kevin Grady Trustee
THE BRODRICK TRUST Recently registered
STEVE BURT Trustee
THE THACKRAY MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST Received: On time
THE PAUL THACKRAY HERITAGE FOUNDATION Received: On time
REVD DR ROY YATES Trustee None on record
Patrick Gillett Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
JOHN RICHARD LUXTON Trustee None on record
DR ALAN BENJAMIN SLOMSON Trustee 08 May 2012 None on record
MARGARET JOSEPHINE PULLAN Trustee 18 April 2016
THE YORKSHIRE LADIES' COUNCIL OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
DEREK HENRY MARTIN Trustee 08 April 2013 None on record
SUE ALEXANDER Trustee None on record
JANET DOUGLAS BA MA Trustee
LEEDS PHILOSOPHICAL AND LITERARY SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
JOHN HENRY TOWNSEND Trustee None on record
EVE MARY BROOK ALLIBONE-DREDGE SRN SCM Trustee 07 April 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR PETER MEREDITH Trustee 11 May 2012 None on record
EVE BRADFORD Trustee 10 May 2012 None on record