Financial history SRI NABH KAMAL RAJA SAHEB TRUST

Charity number: 1125436
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £49.30k £53.58k £45.80k £113.41k £98.31k
Total expenditure £66.05k £32.32k £36.68k £92.39k £78.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.99k