Trustees METROPOLITAN POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1125409
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Gaskain Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
Jonathan Osborne Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Andy Picton Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Phil Van Tromp Trustee 18 December 2017
None on record
Graham McNulty Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
Clive Knight Trustee 05 August 2014
THE METROPOLITAN AND CITY POLICE ORPHANS FUND
Received: On time
Paul Deller Trustee 01 March 2013
METROPOLITAN POLICE SPORTS FUND
Received: 31 days late
SIMON NOEL OVENS Trustee
METROPOLITAN POLICE SPORTS FUND
Received: 31 days late