AUSTIN FRIARS

Charity number: 1125641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.94k £24.04k £19.64k £22.28k £6.23k
Total expenditure £14.67k £16.07k £16.33k £23.67k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A