Financial history THE MARK ANTHONY TRUST

Charity number: 1128825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £106.03k £115.00k £125.02k £125.36k £135.56k
Total expenditure £105.50k £225.00k £156.69k £200.60k £100.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A