ALPHA INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1126140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £271.10k £251.36k £201.25k £208.81k £166.35k
Total expenditure £76.51k £136.44k £150.78k £149.92k £166.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A