SHRI GURU RAVIDASS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020 30/03/2021
Total gross income £52.53k £40.33k £44.68k £44.13k £21.33k
Total expenditure £74.61k £25.15k £24.99k £17.68k £17.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A