Governing document Sun Kyeong Qi
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 DECEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 APR 2017 as amended on 10 Jul 2019 as amended on 14 Apr 2022 as amended on 14 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF THE COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE THERAPY 'SUN KYEONG'; B TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF THOSE IN SICKNESS OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF THE COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE THERAPY 'SUN KYEONG'; AND C TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE THERAPY 'SUN KYEONG'. 'SUN KYEONG' IS DEFINED AS: 'INSTRUCTION COURSES AND QI TREATMENT RELATING TO HEALTH WITH FOCUS ON THE USE AND UNDERSTANDING OF NATURAL VITAL ENERGY, ALSO KNOWN AS BIO-ENERGY. HEALTH CARE RELATING TO EXERCISE, TRAINING AND THERAPEUTIC MASSAGE WITH FOCUS ON THE USE AND UNDERSTANDING OF NATURAL VITAL ENERGY, ALSO KNOWN AS BIO-ENERGY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.