ROYAL SOCIETY FOR PUBLIC HEALTH

Charity number: 1125949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time Download