GRAMEEN WELFARE SMILE CHARITY

Charity number: 1126521
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £7.00k £9.00k £9.50k £8.60k £9.80k
Total expenditure £6.70k £8.60k £9.00k £8.50k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A