MINARET COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1127464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2017 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required