CADELEIGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1126478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.51k £5.89k £5.40k £7.59k £7.34k
Total expenditure £3.01k £4.26k £7.57k £7.17k £7.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A