Financial history GOD'S INTERNATIONAL DELIVERANCE CHURCH

Charity number: 1127278
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.89k £15.20k £25.71k £12.01k £19.10k
Total expenditure £10.93k £7.63k £15.18k £25.10k £13.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A