JJ'S MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1128222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £20.79k £9.18k £9.87k £4.80k £7.01k
Total expenditure £12.75k £19.83k £9.49k £4.65k £9.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A