THE EDWARD SMART CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1126892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £53.35k £58.97k £61.22k £58.55k £49.45k
Total expenditure £48.78k £81.40k £81.70k £119.36k £64.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A