Trustees THE RAILWAY MISSION
Charity number: 1128024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Castledine | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Giles | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Bellenger | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Volossevich | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Julia Melanie Jaegar | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Scott Ferguson | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jon Smith | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Hailes | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.