MUJTABA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1127457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £87.01k £48.46k £52.98k £39.24k £56.56k
Total expenditure £97.24k £42.41k £56.20k £40.72k £50.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A