Trustees YOUNG SOLUTIONS WORCESTERSHIRE
Charity number: 1128461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Robert Hill | Chair | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mulhall | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Berry | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tominski | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leslie Ashwell | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GABRIEL DUDDINGTON | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR RICHARD GARETH ROBERTS | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY TAYLOR-SMITH | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Michael Douglas Hunter | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.