BE INSPIRED TO LTD

Charity number: 1129374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.05k £0 £1.05k £2.48k £1.29k
Total expenditure £116 £936 £1.48k £4.49k £427
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.41k £0 N/A N/A N/A