Financial history WATERHARVEST

Charity number: 1127564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £298.79k £290.48k £355.23k £417.19k £410.22k
Total expenditure £295.59k £292.33k £362.14k £399.43k £359.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A