Financial history JESUS POWER HOUSE MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 1128363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £79.86k £138.39k £459.37k £498.39k
Total expenditure £0 £79.86k £138.39k £459.37k £498.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A