BLAZE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127651
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £165.26k £105.56k £85.07k £26.79k £41.05k
Total expenditure £137.50k £84.29k £99.54k £12.32k £40.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £25.00k £26.79k N/A