BIDEFORD STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1127853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £5.85k £6.52k £9.37k £9.68k £12.03k
Total expenditure £6.96k £6.65k £8.05k £7.56k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £850