Trustees ALL SAINTS KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Charity number: 1128049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reena Bhupendra Patel | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Julian John Adams | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Herbert Nash | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Charles Gillard | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Joseph Barnaby Moffatt | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
John Edward Dewhurst | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Joan Timmins | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Keith Melvyn Long | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Ann Deller | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sheila Bryant | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Philip Walker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Roshan Naveenchandra Jathanna | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Lucy Anne Emerson | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Peter Roy Reddell | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alastair Deller | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Kelly | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Mary Janet Warman | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Samantha Taylor | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
ISABEL BEATRICE ISAACSON | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|||||||
EITHNE JAN FRAY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PAUL URWIN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.