NOWANS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1137971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.32k £1.57k £989 £22.40k £18.51k
Total expenditure £4.60k £1.53k £985 £15.82k £24.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £300