Financial history THE WALK CENTRE

Charity number: 1129576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £31.90k £27.42k £20.72k £25.61k £23.18k
Total expenditure £37.88k £32.15k £25.90k £20.63k £20.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A