Trustees AIR LEAGUE TRUST
Charity number: 1129969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John B Steel KC | Chair | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRASER PERKINS | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Findlay Scott Baker | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Teresa Bernie | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CHRISTIAN KEELING | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Zoe Marie Layden | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire MacAleese | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Grenville Robert Hodge | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Justin Greaves | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Charles Whitney | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.