THE JACK RILEY TRUST

Charity number: 1129014
Charity reporting is overdue by 903 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Annual return 20 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Annual return 20 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 903 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 903 days
Annual return 20 August 2017 23 July 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2017 24 October 2018 126 days late Download
Annual return 20 August 2016 24 August 2017 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2016 23 August 2017 64 days late Download