Financial history APPS FOR GOOD

Charity number: 1133656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £787.08k £697.97k £677.32k £493.96k £527.53k
Total expenditure £757.83k £687.80k £593.14k £492.06k £526.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £67.62k £697.49k £15.68k N/A £1.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £719.33k £0 £653.93k N/A £525.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £130 £484 £941 N/A £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £6.76k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £675.61k £632.06k £543.74k N/A £442.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £82.21k £55.74k £49.40k N/A £83.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.58k £0 N/A £7.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0