Trustees EMERGE 3RS
Charity number: 1132944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bertrand Stern-Gillet | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Benjamin Barnett | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Aileen Edmunds | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shirley Jones | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Roger Chicken | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Brigit Egan | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona King | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Baldwinson | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Erinma Bell | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Michelle Duncalf | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.