Trustees LEEDS UNIVERSITY UNION
Charity number: 1136742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Tabern | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shmuel von Weisl | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rimsha Khan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elyse Catterall | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Padula Pinho | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Haryati Mohammed | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ella Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Corner | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Steven Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mberi | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Adedamola Timeyin | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Henry Clephan | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Kate Tonge | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.