ARYANA AID

Charity number: 1130232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £106.04k £97.52k £183.34k £250.95k £188.74k
Total expenditure £105.87k £96.00k £179.62k £245.77k £190.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A