THE WEST ESSEX ALCOHOL AND DRUGS SERVICE

Charity number: 1129267
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £359.84k £296.68k £296.83k £284.33k £305.05k
Total expenditure £315.00k £290.00k £310.59k £309.15k £332.53k
Income from government contracts N/A £216.10k £216.10k £207.00k £207.00k
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k £0 £0 N/A