Trustees RICHMOND AND TWICKENHAM PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1130806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordana Ilic | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colette Hewitt | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Fisher | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Durnford | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew George Clifton | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Day LRPS | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Highton | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Clifton ARPS | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Akers LRPS | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT OWEN CHARNOCK FIBMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.