Financial history AUDACIOUS CHURCH

Charity number: 1129633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.64m £3.32m £3.09m £4.05m £2.84m
Total expenditure £2.16m £2.08m £2.36m £2.52m £1.95m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.14m £2.73m £2.42m £3.48m £2.68m
Income - Other trading activities £303.61k £146.38k £167.73k £115.63k £100.86k
Income - Charitable activities £194.73k £354.98k £340.91k £315.07k £57.65k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £921 £90.85k £158.53k £130.07k £3.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £6.68k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.00m £2.31m £2.47m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £154.50k £71.90k £44.23k £52.40k £98.29k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £65.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0