Trustees PRINCIPAL FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF HERTFORD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Charity number: 1137527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
40 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Federica Romei | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carissa Veliz | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vladyslav Vyazovskiy | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lambros Malafouris | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dawid Kielak | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Wheare | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Sloan | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aruna Nair | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anette Mikes | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fernanda Duarte Gonzalez | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Petros Ligoxygakis | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andreas Galanis | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Greasley | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Louise Slater | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elizabeth Baldwin | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Siddharth Giridhar Ashok Parameswaran | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE CLARK | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian McBride | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Dwan | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Wooldridge | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID GREAVES | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Manolis Chatzis | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GIORA STERNBERG | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor JAMIE LORIMER | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bjarke Frellesvig | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Hopkin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALAN LAUDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF CHARLOTTE BREWER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor RADOSLAW ZUBEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor MARTIN MAIDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KATHERINE LUNN-ROCKLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF ZHANFENG CUI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF PETER MILLICAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STEVE NEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR JIEUN KIAER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF ALISON WOOLLARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
Professor EMMA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAVID THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr OLIVER NOBLE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor CLAIRE VALLANCE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.