Trustees NORTHERN TAMIL ASSOCIATION (UK)
Charity number: 1130579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kavitha Sethumadhavan | Chair | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kavithamani Saraswathi | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sivabalan Balachandran | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Santhanakrishnan Balasubramaniam | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ram Vinayagam | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Siva shankar | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kalyana Raman Venkatraman | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUBBARAMAN VARADHARAJAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAGAPPAN CHIDAMBARAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ASOKAN KRISHNAIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VENKAT SRINIVASAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr RAMANATHAN KANDASAMY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ARUTCHELVAM VIJAYARAMAN MD, MRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.