Trustees CENTRE FOR ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING EXCELLENCE
Charity number: 1133396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Ellen Le Vaillant | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Ian Philip Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Benyoucef Houheche | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Hutchins | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Noorzaman Rashid | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Alessandro Attanasio | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Stubbings | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Findlay Macalpine | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Barak Maoz | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Simon Richman | Trustee | 08 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Canon Judith Jane Armitt | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr KEYVAN MEHDI DJAMARANI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.