Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S NURSERY ASHFORD

Charity number: 1132245
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 September 2021 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window