BRAUNTON ACADEMY PARENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1130314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.08k £131 £1.62k £2.27k £14.01k
Total expenditure £5.49k £107 £370 £1.73k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A