BHW LIMITED

Charity number: 1130437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £48.05k £389.55k £1.32k £1.55k £1.59k
Total expenditure £139.90k £98.41k £1.79k £1.96k £1.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A