Trustees NEWHAM NEW DEAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1132937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Ludlam MBE, JP Chair
None on record
Eloise Swales Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Amalia Loizidou Trustee 25 October 2022
INSPIRE LGBT
Received: On time
Jaston Rodrigues Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Ms Farzana Choudhuri Trustee 17 October 2017
None on record
Hazel Maria Taverner Trustee 24 February 2015
BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS
Overdue by 1207 days
JEAN LUDLAM Trustee 24 May 2012
None on record