DESMOND ANDERSON SPECIAL SUPPORT CENTRE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.35k £10.15k £4.17k £8.86k £3.66k
Total expenditure £7.30k £3.98k £9.26k £4.28k £11.59k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A