Trustees THE MANOR HOUSE CENTRE FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING
Charity number: 1131804
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Louise Bragoli | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saral Markanday | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ron Finlay FRSA | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lewis | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Grunwald | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hommel | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.